Search results
From The Dreadnought Project
Jump to navigationJump to search
- ...tsRow|Preceded by<br>'''[[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]]'''|'''[[H.M.S. Lookout (1914)|Captain of H.M.S. ''Lookout'']]'''<br>9 Sep8 KB (1,148 words) - 23:17, 6 April 2022
- ...ref>|Succeeded by<br>'''[[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]]'''}}8 KB (1,238 words) - 22:09, 6 April 2022
- ...ref>|Succeeded by<br>'''[[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]]'''}}8 KB (1,236 words) - 15:14, 7 April 2022
- ...ref>|Succeeded by<br>'''[[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]]'''}}10 KB (1,569 words) - 22:42, 6 April 2022
- ...’s]] [[Battle Cruiser Force|Battle Cruiser Fleet]] and Vizeadmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper’s]] [[I. Aufklärungsgruppe|I Scouting Group]]. B4 KB (606 words) - 20:01, 14 April 2022
- ...ref>|Succeeded by<br>'''[[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]]'''}}11 KB (1,620 words) - 22:24, 9 June 2022
- On 3 November 1914, a German force under Konteradmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper]] bombarded [[Great Yarmouth]] and [[Lowestoft]].5 KB (737 words) - 16:49, 4 April 2020
- ...the R.M.A. was replaced by Behncke, who in the same month was replaced by Ritter von Mann Edler von Tiechler, latterly head of the U-boat office.7 KB (1,037 words) - 22:00, 30 August 2013
- ...isted the signal 'Enemy in sight.' Both the B.C.F. and Vizeadmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper’s]] [[I. Aufklärungsgruppe|I Scouting Group]] ha6 KB (1,004 words) - 15:25, 1 March 2024
- ...ohl|von Ingenohl]], under pressure for action from his subordinate [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Hipper]], decided to bombard the British coastal towns of Scarbo Konteradmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper's]] force of {{DE-Seydlitz|f=p}} (flag), {{DE-Moltk14 KB (2,220 words) - 13:53, 1 November 2021
- ...led by Konteradmiral [[Friedrich Boedicker]] because Konteradmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper]], their normal commander, was indisposed. His forc9 KB (1,480 words) - 20:51, 12 May 2020
- ...a few knots, meaning that he would have to abandon her, as Admiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz von Hipper]] had had to do with {{DE-Blucher|f=tp}} at the12 KB (1,758 words) - 23:56, 18 October 2021
- ...main body was to the north-eastward. At the same time, {{ViceDE}} [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Hipper]], with the German battle cruisers, believing himself hea15 KB (2,174 words) - 15:14, 7 April 2022
- At 08:50, Konteradmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper]] had requested permission to move the battlecruise23 KB (3,511 words) - 16:44, 23 April 2020
- ...ed on ''Invincible's'' port side, heavily engaged with Vizeadmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Hipper's]] [[I. Aufklärungsgruppe|I Scouting Group]]. Having r20 KB (3,166 words) - 01:11, 7 November 2021
- ...n of their own for 23 January. The battlecruisers of Konteradmiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Franz Hipper's]] 1st Scouting Group of three battlecruisers and27 KB (4,281 words) - 22:52, 6 January 2022
- ...ce-Admiral Scheer was promoted to Admiral, and he and Vice-Admiral [[Franz Ritter von Hipper|Hipper]] received the Pour le Merite.52 KB (8,873 words) - 00:56, 2 March 2024
- ...Nash|Reginald Nash]] -> [[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]], 15 Feb, 1918 - 21 Jun, 1918 ** 48 days : [[Maxwell Alexander Christian Ritter|Maxwell A. C. Ritter]] -> [[John Milne Henderson|John M. Henderson]], 23 Jul, 1918 - 9 Sep, 1918673 KB (90,037 words) - 17:57, 6 May 2024